MANCHESTER AND STOCKPORT CANAL SOCIETY LIMITED
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The charity is raising awareness of the history of the canal & its importance in the developoment of Reddish & east Manchester through interpretation boards, having a stall at local festivals and an educational pack for schools. It is to develop a strategy for future activities & is to undertake studies to establish whether there is an valid economic justification for restoring the waterway.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 30 September 2014
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Chwaraeon/adloniant
- Amgylchedd/cadwraeth/treftadaeth
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Hamdden
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Gweithredu Fel Corff Mantell Neu Gorff Adnoddau
- Dinas Manceinion
- Stockport
Llywodraethu
- 23 Hydref 2006: Cofrestrwyd
- 03 Medi 2015: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 30/09/2010 | 30/09/2011 | 30/09/2012 | 30/09/2013 | 30/09/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £3.01k | £925 | £551 | £708 | £90 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £1.34k | £3.43k | £930 | £572 | £0 | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2014 | 20 Gorffennaf 2015 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2014 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2013 | 07 Hydref 2013 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2013 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2012 | 25 Mehefin 2013 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2012 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2011 | 25 Mehefin 2013 | 330 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2011 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 SEPTEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED AT AN EXTRAORDINARY GENERAL MEETING DATED 1 JUNE 2006.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) THE RESTORATION, RECONSTRUCTION, PRESERVATION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE MANCHESTER & STOCKPORT BRANCH CANAL AND THE CONSERVATION OF ITS NATURAL CHARACTER AS AN INLAND WATERWAY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. (B) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE HISTORY AND USE OF THE CANAL. (C) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Maes buddion
THE MANCHESTER AND STOCKPORT CANAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window