THENMARADCHI DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide support for education, socio-economical projects, healthcare and medical needs
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 14 July 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUBRAMANIAM SRIHARAN | Trustee | 06 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
SATHASIVAM SATHYAMOORTHY | Trustee | 20 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Vettivelu Asokan | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/12/2019 | 30/12/2020 | 30/12/2021 | 30/12/2022 | 30/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.44k | £21.45k | £49.49k | £5.91k | £3.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.44k | £19.05k | £15.79k | £10.16k | £6.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 JUNE 2006
Charitable objects
A TO ACTIVATE AND ORGANISE, ENABLING MANY EXPATRIATES FROM THIS REGION AND WELL WISHERS OF THIS REGION, LIVING THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM TO GET TOGETHER, BOTH NATIONALLY AND REGIONALLY IN HEALTHY FELLOWSHIP WITH THE MOTIVE OF ENABLING THE INHABITANTS OF THIS REGION TO RELIEVE THEMSELVES FROM POVERTY, HAVE ACCESS TO THE BASIC NEEDS AND BENEFIT FROM PUBLIC SERVICES TO IMPROVE THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE. B TO PROMOTE GOODWILL, UNITY AND COOPERATION AMONG THE MEMBERS OF OTHER SIMILAR ORGANISATIONS INSIDE AND OUTSIDE UK WHOSE OBJECTS ARE ALSO IN WHOLE OR IN PART ALIGNS WITH THOSE OF THE ASSOCIATION. C TO ACT AS A FORUM, PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR DISCUSSION(S) AND INFORMED DEBATE(S) ON MANY INTERESTS OF THENMARADCHI AND EXCHANGING INFORMATION FOR THE SPIRITUAL, CULTURAL, ECONOMICAL, MOTIVATIONAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT OF THE PEOPLE OF THENMARADCHI. ALSO, SERVE TO ORGANISE SOCIAL GATHERINGS, SPORTS ACTIVITIES, CONCERTS, SEMINARS, FILM SHOWS AND TOURS TO ACHIEVE THE AIMS AND OBJECTIVES OF THE ASSOCIATION. D TO FOSTER A CLOSE AND FRIENDLY RELATIONSHIP BETWEEN THE MEMBERS OF THE ASSOCIATION AND THE MEMBERS/OFFICERS OF LOCAL INSTITUTIONS (EG SCHOOLS, HOSPITALS AND LOCAL BODIES) AND PARTICIPATE AND ASSIST IN PROJECTS DESIGNED/INITIATED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE REGION. E TO ACT AS A COLLECTIVE FUND RAISING BODY WITH A VIEW TO SUPPORT AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THENMARADCHI TO RELIEVE SUCH PERSONS WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS OR WHO ARE OTHERWISE IN NEED, TO ADVANCE EDUCATIONAL NEEDS, TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS AND TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE THEIR HEALTH. F TO DO ALL SUCH OTHER LAWFUL THINGS AS MAY FURTHER THE ASSOCIATION'S OBJECTIVES AND STRIVE TO TAKE EVERY PRECAUTION TO ENSURE THAT THE IMAGE OF THE ASSOCIATION IS PRESERVED AND ITS REPUTATION SAFEGUARDED. G TO FINANCE UNDERTAKINGS AND PROJECTS AIMED AT IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THENMARADCHI PEOPLE AFTER THE ESTABLISHMENT OF SCOPE, COSTS, SCHEDULES AND RISKS/BENEFITS IN WRIT
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Manor Road
Cheam
Sutton
SM2 7AG
- Phone:
- 07984924502
- Email:
- thenmaradchiuk@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window