THE GREAT FOOTBALL GIVEAWAY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Delivery of sports equipment (in particular footballs) to children living in under developed or developing countries in Africa and elsewhere.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Angola
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Malawi
- Rwanda
- Sierra Leone
- Tanzania
- Uganda
- Zambia
Governance
- 03 March 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES HUNTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KELLY DALGLISH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DUNCAN THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALEXANDER JAMES LATNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL ANTHONY CLARKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SARAH PATRICIA CLARKE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.54k | £1.78k | £244 | £246 | £1.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.38k | £4.16k | £472 | £1.16k | £1.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 25 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 25 March 2022 | 238 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 30 March 2021 | 243 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 FEBRUARY 2006
Charitable objects
1) TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES, EQUIPMENT FOR SPORT, RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SPORTS EQUIPMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Priory Cottage
Abbey Lane
Hinton Charterhouse
Bath
BA2 7TD
- Phone:
- 01225 571160
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window