HOUNSLOW MUSLIM WOMEN'S ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1114549
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £3.74k £0 £254.06k £299.40k £132.72k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £252.57k £254.84k £78.53k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A