ROBERT ARMITAGE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grant making trust fund
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bolton
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Wigan
Governance
- 07 March 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ben Ward | Chair | 09 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rhiannon Roberts | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ed Moloney | Trustee | 23 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £97.14k | £58.38k | £34.65k | £36.06k | £23.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.84k | £11.35k | £9.97k | £9.52k | £16.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 12 June 2023 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 12 June 2023 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 06 June 2022 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 06 June 2022 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 26 October 2020 | 148 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 26 October 2020 | 148 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28 APRIL 2004
Charitable objects
(A) TO MAKE GRANTS AND PROVIDE ASSISTANCE TO REGISTERED OR EXEMPT CHARITIES, WHETHER LOCATED OR WORKING WITHIN THE GREATER MANCHESTER AREA, NATIONALLY OR INTERNATIONALLY; (B) TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES, BOTH LOCALLY TO THE GREATER MANCHESTER AREA, NATIONALLY AND INTERNATIONALLY AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DECIDE
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Union
Manchester Metropolitan University
21 Higher Cambridge Street
Manchester
M15 6AD
- Phone:
- 01612471162
- Email:
- E.Moloney@salford.ac.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window