SOUTHAMPTON AREA YOUTH INVOLVEMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1117382
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2009 21 June 2010 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2009 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2008 21 September 2009 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2008 21 September 2009 On time
Annual return 30 November 2007 30 September 2008 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2007 26 September 2008 On time