Trustees THE ARDEN DECORATIVE AND FINE ARTS SOCIETY

Charity number: 1113086
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARIA ELIZABETH GRAHAM Chair 29 June 2012
None on record
Mary Elizabeth Christine Ghali Trustee 26 October 2018
None on record
Ann Muriel Protheroe Trustee 28 September 2018
None on record
MRS RONA HALL Trustee 29 June 2017
None on record
JULIA ANNE HOLL-ALLEN Trustee 29 June 2017
None on record
MRS PENNY HOSKINS Trustee 26 November 2015
None on record
DAVID GEORGESON Trustee 26 November 2015
None on record
DONALD NORMAN TOUT Trustee 25 June 2015
None on record
MARY LOUISE HENRICKSEN Trustee 25 June 2015
None on record
Ann Mann Trustee 31 October 2013
None on record