SANDBLAST LTD

Charity number: 1115288
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £33.35k £34.60k £2.16k £21.78k £6.52k
Total expenditure £14.18k £21.19k £8.38k £13.41k £24.22k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A