AL MUNIR WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1116533
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.99k £576 £375 £728 £10.05k
Total expenditure £3.05k £375 £526 £766 £8.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A