ACTIVE HOPE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WWN project continues to be delivered in 12 Warrington Primary Schools.Adventure Academy is well established with 60 children involved this year. Active Mentoring/Trainee Instructor programme also working well at a local special school. Active Hope partnered with 2 local primary schools to facilitate residential experiences for years 3,4 & 5 at one school & year 6 at the other school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Warrington
Governance
- 25 April 2006: Standard registration
- 09 December 2014: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 09 December 2014: Funds transferred to 1140534 ACTIVE HOPE
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2010 | 30/09/2011 | 30/09/2012 | 30/09/2013 | 30/09/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £113.59k | £122.70k | £24.68k | £5.58k | £1.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £111.12k | £140.53k | £42.93k | £6.80k | £2.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2014 | 28 November 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2013 | 03 April 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2012 | 24 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2011 | 22 June 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2011 | 22 June 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19 APRIL 2006.
Charitable objects
(1) TO EDUCATE AND ASSIST YONG PEOPLE THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED. (2) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENTS OF BELIEF APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window