MIRI ROSHNI

Charity number: 1117326
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2019 28 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 28 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2018 04 October 2019 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 04 October 2019 4 days late Download
Annual return 30 November 2017 04 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 04 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2016 14 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 14 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2015 16 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2015 16 August 2016 On time Download