MIRI ROSHNI

Charity number: 1117326
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/11/2015 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019
Total gross income £96.27k £114.69k £174.04k £149.15k £149.09k
Total expenditure £82.68k £158.18k £171.13k £136.32k £146.79k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A