UK CMC (UK CHRISTIAN MUSIC CHARTS)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian faith by means of broadcasting a Christian music tv programme, which includes a variety of Christian artistes performing Christian songs to reach out to todays generation. General charitable purposes as the trustees deem fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Walsall
Governance
- 02 June 2006: Standard registration
- 24 May 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- UK ACMC (UK CHRISTIAN MUSIC CHARTS) (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.38k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.23k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 30 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 30 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 17 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 JANUARY 2006 AS AMENDED ON 16 DECEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
A THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH MAINLY BY MEANS OF BROADCASTING CHRISTIAN MESSAGES THROUGH THE MEANS OF A CHRISTIAN MUSIC TV PROGRAMME. B THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY MEANS OF PROMOTING CHRISTIAN MUSIC TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC. C. TO SUPPORT SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM FIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.