HOME-START HARWICH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Home-Start offers friendship and informal support to parents with young children, in local communities throughout the UK so that every child can have a good start in life. Home-Start Harwich supports local families by means of a family group as well as a home visiting service by volunteers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 03 May 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CATHERINE OFFORD | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
Paul Kinzett | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Lucy Mann | Trustee | 31 May 2016 |
|
|
||||||
PAULENE FORD | Trustee | 24 January 2012 |
|
|
||||||
ROBERTA THOMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
RICHARD COLLEY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £166.71k | £249.08k | £216.87k | £251.60k | £355.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £168.02k | £174.72k | £191.89k | £237.77k | £298.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £244.03k | £211.14k | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 March 2024 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 JANUARY 2006
Charitable objects
A) TO SAFEGUARD, PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL OF CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; B) TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO OR MALTREATMENT OF CHILDREN C) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, POVERTY AND NEED AMONGST CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; D) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BETTER STANDARDS OF CHILDCARE WITHIN THE AREAS OF HARWICH, DOVERCOURT, RAMSEY AND LITTLE OAKLEY
Area of benefit
ESSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. NICHOLAS HALL
STOUR ROAD
HARWICH
ESSEX
CO12 3HS
- Phone:
- 01255556230
- Email:
- info@homestartharwich.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window