Financial history THE CREATE TRUST

Charity number: 1115157
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 11/09/2017 11/09/2018 11/09/2019 11/09/2020 11/09/2021
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £700 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A