NICOLA CORRY SUPPORT FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Nicola Corry Support Foundation (NCSF) is a registered charity focused on helping families that have been affected by cancer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 15 June 2006: Standard registration
- 06 February 2024: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 06 February 2024: Funds transferred to 284881 PENNY BROHN CANCER CARE
- NICOLA CORRY SUPPORT FUND (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.03k | £30.00k | £13.52k | £21.29k | £12.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.44k | £22.05k | £19.58k | £17.60k | £15.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 14 April 2023 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 23 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 NOVEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED 11 MAY 2006 AND 24 MAY 2007.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONG SUFFERERS FROM CANCER AND THEIR FAMILIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE SOUTH WEST.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window