Trustees FRIENDS OF FRIENDLESS CHURCHES LIMITED
Charity number: 1113097
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER EVANS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Kirstie Robbins | Trustee | 27 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
John William Edwards | Trustee | 20 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simon John Morton Evans | Trustee | 08 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jack Alexander Barrow | Trustee | 08 October 2016 |
|
|||||
George Bulmer | Trustee | 03 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elizabeth Green | Trustee | 03 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
SIR PAUL BRITTON | Trustee | 11 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr JOHN MORGAN GUY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev PHILIP GRAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER SCOTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Catherine Cullis | Trustee |
|
||||||
John Vigar | Trustee |
|
||||||
HOWARD POOL | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr Richard Halsey | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.