Financial history COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATION FOR MINORITY COMMUNITIES LTD

Charity number: 1114410
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £24.05k £33.41k £51.94k £82.17k £38.42k
Total expenditure £23.30k £31.66k £36.66k £48.34k £45.14k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A