Accounts and annual returns THE LONDON CENTRE FOR DOMESTIC VIOLENCE TRUST
Charity number: 1115360
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2010 | 20 May 2011 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2010 | 16 May 2011 | 16 days late | |
Annual return | 30 June 2009 | 02 June 2010 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2009 | 06 April 2010 | On time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2008 | 09 September 2009 | 132 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2008 | 11 September 2009 | 134 days late | |
Annual return | 30 June 2007 | 15 April 2008 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2007 | 15 April 2008 | On time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window