Financial history CHURCHES TOGETHER IN BRITAIN AND IRELAND

Charity number: 1113299
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £479.12k £469.05k £743.27k £683.07k £544.05k
Total expenditure £597.27k £599.65k £745.59k £745.77k £479.17k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £287.33k £248.94k £156.81k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £26.14k £9.35k £4.49k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £429.81k £380.18k £382.75k
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £44.60k £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £78.02k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £734.86k £730.71k £462.97k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £10.73k £15.06k £16.21k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £19.22k £22.78k £16.02k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £148.32k £109.64k £23.75k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £10.73k £15.06k £16.21k
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0