Trustees CHURCHES TOGETHER IN BRITAIN AND IRELAND

Charity number: 1113299
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Graham Sparkes Chair 23 September 2020
None on record
Rev Alexander Gardner Horsburgh Trustee 03 October 2022
None on record
Fr Jan Nowotnik Trustee 22 September 2021
None on record
Rev Kevin Mackenzie Trustee 22 September 2021
None on record
RIGHT REV DR ROSEMARIE MALLETT Trustee 23 September 2020
ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL SYDENHAM, TRUST FUND
Received: On time
SHIRLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
THE WINTER EXHIBITION
Received: On time
THE SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
GREEN COAT EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE EASTERBROOK THORLEY SCHOLARSHIP ICW THE BOUTCHER SCHOOLS
Received: On time
BACON'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
KENNINGTON OVAL NATIONAL SCHOOL (NOW KNOWN AS LAMBETH, ST MARK'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL
Received: On time
Rt. Rev. John Perumbalath Trustee 23 September 2020
THE CHARITY FOR LICENSED MINISTERS IN THE DIOCESE OF CHELMSFORD
Received: On time
CHRISTIANS AWARE
Received: On time
Rev Andrew Forster Trustee 23 September 2020
None on record
Rachel Judith Lampard Trustee 10 May 2017
None on record
PATRICIA WHITE Trustee 10 May 2017
None on record
ALAN ANDERSON Trustee 11 May 2016
None on record
LIEUT-COLONEL JONATHAN ROBERTS Trustee 11 May 2016
None on record
Dr PATRICK JOSEPH COYLE Trustee 04 May 2016
CYTUN:EGLWYSI YNGHYD YNG NGHYMRU / CHURCHES TOGETHER IN WALES LIMITED
Received: On time
Dr ELIZABETH HARRIS Trustee 06 April 2016
None on record
MONSIGNOR NICHOLAS ROTHON Trustee 17 March 2011
SECULAR CLERGY NEW COMMON FUND
Received: On time
The Right Reverend Paul Hendricks Trustee
CANON TIERNEY TRUST
Received: On time
HONORA TURNER O'CALLAGHAN SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Received: On time
CHARITY FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION IN THE ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESES OF SOUTHWARK AND ARUNDEL AND BRIGHTON
Received: 66 days late
DUFFY BEQUEST
Received: On time
THE CATHOLIC ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
WOODROFFE BEQUEST ADMINISTERED BY (THE ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE OF SOUTHWARK)
Received: On time
BUTLER TRUST
Received: On time
HOWARD OF GLOSSOP BEQUEST
Received: On time
THE ALLENBY ENDOWMENT IN CONNECTION WITH CRAYFORD R C SCHOOL
Received: On time
ROBINSON BEQUEST
Received: On time
DUKE OF NORFOLK TRUST
Received: On time
REDMOND'S CHARITY
Received: On time
DEPTFORD POOR FUND
Received: On time
MRS C J I B GORDON-CANNING'S PRIESTS' TRUST (LONDON)
Received: On time
WEDGEWOOD ENDOWMENT ADMINISTERED BY (THE ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE OF SOUTHWARK)
Received: On time
WILLIAMS SOUTHWARK FUND
Received: On time
WHITTINGHAM BEQUEST
Received: On time
DE SAMPAYO BEQUEST
Received: On time
THE INCORPORATED CATHOLIC TRUTH SOCIETY
Received: On time
SOUTHWARK TAYLOR EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE BLUNDELL CHARITABLE FUND
Received: On time
GILLIAN KINGSTON Trustee
None on record