Accounts and annual returns Amin Welfare Foundation

Charity number: 1113372
Charity reporting is overdue by 639 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 14 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 274 days
Accounts and TAR 14 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 274 days
Annual return 14 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 639 days
Accounts and TAR 14 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 639 days
Annual return 14 December 2020 22 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 14 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 14 December 2019 24 February 2021 133 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 14 December 2018 30 September 2020 352 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 December 2018 Not Required