TAYWOOD NURSERY SCHOOL EXTENDED SERVICES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Nursery for children aged birth to 5; after school club and wrap around care
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 25 July 2006: Standard registration
- 01 December 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
- ACCRINGTON ROAD FIRST STEPS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £392.93k | £405.69k | £378.26k | £168.12k | £1.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £370.74k | £412.11k | £383.21k | £203.89k | £40.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £99.33k | £103.00k | £38.54k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 18 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 05 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 05 December 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 22 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 22 January 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 OCTOBER 2003 AS AMENDED TO CHANGE NAME 3 SEPTEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE HIGH QUALITY EDUCATION, FULL AND PART TIME, FOR CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE, IN THE DISTRICT OF BURNLEY BY OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY AND LEARNING FACILITIES, ENSURING THAT SUCH FACILITIES ARE FOR ALL CHILDREN IRRESPECTIVE OF RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; AND IN ADDITION TO THE FOREGOING, TO OFFER APPROPRIATE TRAINING COURSES FOR PARENTS AND FAMILIES OF CHILDREN AS DEFINED ABOVE.
Area of benefit
THE DISTRICT OF BURNLEY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window