UK DERMATOLOGY CLINICAL TRIALS NETWORK (UK DCTN)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main purpose of the UKDCTN is to conduct independent, high quality, multi-centre clinical trials to answer questions of importance to clinicians and patients in dermatology. The Network is open to trial suggestions from anyone with an interest in skin disease. The Network provides 'hands on' advice and guidance in developing clinical trials. All UKDCTN trials are non-commercial.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
250 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 10 August 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Beth Stuart | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jane Sterling | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rubeta Matin | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr KIM SUZANNE THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr CARRON PATRICIA LAYFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICK LEVELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR HYWEL WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.26k | £11.07k | £22.60k | £23.68k | £23.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.94k | £4.60k | £26.48k | £19.14k | £20.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 AUGUST 2003 AS AMENDED FEBRUARY 2004, 5 JULY 2006 AND 8 JULY 2010.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH IN CONNECTION WITH THE TREATMENT AND PREVENTION OF SKIN DISEASES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BY GI. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Applied Health Research Building
Building number 42
University of Nottingham
University Park
Nottingham
NG7 2RD
- Phone:
- 01158468621
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window