JAMES SQUARE PLYMOUTH LIMITED

Charity number: 1113776
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £1.23m £1.22m £1.17m £1.21m £1.20m
Total expenditure £1.23m £1.22m £1.18m £1.22m £1.21m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £64.00k £65.00k £73.00k £74.00k £72.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.17m £1.16m £1.10m £1.14m £1.13m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £64.00k £66.00k £73.00k £73.00k £72.00k
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.17m £1.15m £0 £1.14m £1.13m
Expenditure - Governance £55.00k £57.00k £58.00k £58.00k £63.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £1.15m £0 £1.14m £1.13m
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £1.11m £0 £0