Trustees GABRIELI

Charity number: 1114146
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALISON FIONA MEEK Trustee 11 September 2019
THE VALERIE BESTON ARTISTS' TRUST
Received: On time
PHILIP KING CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: 32 days late
Guy Robert Perricone Trustee 26 March 2019
None on record
Stephen Leslie Barter Trustee 19 May 2018
None on record
Alan Gemes Trustee 01 December 2014
THE BRITISH FRIENDS OF THE BUDAPEST FESTIVAL ORCHESTRA
Received: On time
THE ENGLISH CONCERT
Received: On time
Louise Soden Trustee 01 December 2014
CAMBRIDGE HANDEL OPERA COMPANY
Received: On time
SUSIE YORK SKINNER Trustee 17 June 2014
None on record
Roger Le Tissier Trustee 01 October 2013
None on record
STEVE ALLEN Trustee 04 March 2013
None on record
Michael Steven Abrahms Trustee 06 October 2011
None on record
PAUL DOMINIC MCCREESH Trustee
None on record