SADS UK

Charity number: 1113681
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 11 November 2019 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 11 November 2019 11 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

26 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 18 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

18 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 19 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 19 July 2016 On time Download