Financial history PRIORY PARK AMATEUR BOXING CLUB

Charity number: 1114946
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 30/05/2018 30/05/2019 30/05/2020 30/05/2021
Total gross income £27.72k £24.14k £24.00k £33.14k £40.42k
Total expenditure £19.73k £16.73k £15.48k £23.81k £34.42k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £14.28k £22.25k