Accounts and annual returns A LEG TO STAND ON

Charity number: 1118048
Charity reporting is overdue by 1033 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 302 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 302 days
Annual return 05 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 667 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 667 days
Annual return 05 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1033 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1033 days
Annual return 05 April 2018 30 October 2019 267 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 19 February 2018 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required