Accounts and annual returns CLIFTON COLLEGE ENDOWMENT FUND

Charity number: 1113320
Charity reporting is up to date (148 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 March 2022 148 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 March 2022 148 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 25 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 25 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 14 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 14 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 12 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 12 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window