Trustees CLIFTON COLLEGE ENDOWMENT FUND

Charity number: 1113320
Charity reporting is up to date (148 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Rudge Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Alan Bailey Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Alexander Turco Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
George Harris Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Sebastian D L Hoyle Trustee 15 November 2019
None on record
Brioney Olivia Jean Denner Trustee 15 November 2019
None on record
Major Jeremy Dawson Walters Trustee 15 November 2019
None on record
Tamsin Helena Elizabeth Robertson Trustee 15 November 2019
None on record
James Alistair Isaacs Trustee 11 November 2018
THE DOWNS SCHOOL (CHARLTON HOUSE) LIMITED
Received: On time
Jonathan Harri Greenbury Trustee 01 August 2016
None on record
Matthew John Howard-Cairns Trustee 06 November 2015
None on record
John Francois Alun Davies Trustee 13 February 2014
DOLPHIN SOCIETY
Received: On time
CHARLIE NEWINGTON BRIDGES Trustee 16 May 2013
None on record
MARK GRAHAM ELDRIDGE Trustee
None on record
KATE VICTORIA HOLLAND-SMITH Trustee
None on record