EASY HOUSING ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1115721
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £700.88k £863.61k £778.68k £1.14m £1.70m
Total expenditure £704.58k £808.16k £816.84k £1.02m £1.61m
Income from government contracts £691.17k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £700.88k £863.61k £778.68k £1.14m £1.70m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £140 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £704.58k £808.16k £816.84k £1.02m £1.61m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0