Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CHURCH POLSTEAD

Charity number: 1116464
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £6.55k £9.58k £4.92k £6.54k £9.41k
Total expenditure £10.59k £5.74k £9.06k £4.44k £17.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A