Financial history Punchdrunk Enrichment Limited

Charity number: 1113741
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.83m £2.10m £2.13m £2.16m £1.05m
Total expenditure £1.85m £2.18m £1.95m £1.91m £1.03m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £230.71k £226.30k £226.30k £226.30k £447.37k
Income - Donations and legacies £367.05k £409.21k £432.93k £470.48k £726.43k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.47m £1.69m £1.69m £1.69m £326.54k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £84 £68 £87 £65 £2
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.81m £2.13m £1.90m £1.84m £934.27k
Expenditure - Raising funds £31.29k £52.48k £52.02k £69.14k £92.97k
Expenditure - Governance £20.09k £17.07k £21.95k £18.14k £16.20k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0