Trustees Punchdrunk Enrichment Limited

Charity number: 1113741
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jonathan Hugh Gisby Trustee 10 March 2022
CAMBRIDGE MUSIC FESTIVAL LIMITED
Received: On time
PAMELA GARSIDE Trustee 02 December 2021
THE MOVEMENT FOR NON-MOBILE CHILDREN (WHIZZ-KIDZ)
Received: On time
ANDREW GAMBRELL Trustee 30 April 2020
THE NATIONAL YOUTH ORCHESTRA OF GREAT BRITAIN
Received: On time
Selma Nicholls Trustee 04 December 2019
None on record
Elizabeth Tarn Booth Trustee 04 September 2019
None on record
NICOLE NEWMAN TURNER Trustee 08 October 2018
None on record
Ben Connah Trustee 12 October 2017
THE LAURA CASE TRUST
Received: On time
Paul Davies Trustee 08 December 2015
None on record