SHANTI NAGAR ST ANDREW'S TRUST

Charity number: 1115662
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 23 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 22 March 2021 265 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 12 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 12 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 31 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required