CHARIS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1114043
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 31 August 2019 28 August 2020 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 28 August 2020 59 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 28 August 2020 425 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 28 August 2020 425 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 30 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 30 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 30 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 30 June 2017 On time Download