CHARIS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1114043
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £4.72k £30.12k £65.49k £130.12k £30.07k
Total expenditure £11.36k £32.96k £24.60k £15.30k £18.84k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A