HOME-START BANBURY & CHIPPING NORTON

Charity number: 1114860
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £93.04k £118.05k £135.22k £127.04k £170.26k
Total expenditure £96.20k £101.94k £112.54k £146.93k £116.83k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £2.50k £1.46k N/A £4.60k