HOME-START IOW

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Home-Start I.O.W - A Voluntary organisation committed to promoting the welfare of families with children under five. Volunteers offer regular support, friendship and practical help to families experiencing difficulties, helping to prevent family crisis and breakdown. Support is also offered through group provision.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £75,100 from 2 government contract(s) and £14,963 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
37 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 28 April 2006: Standard registration
- 03 April 2025: Funds received from 1108138 WIGHT DASH
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julian Young | Trustee | 03 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stacey Gearing | Trustee | 05 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maureen O'Flynn | Trustee | 05 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Bailey | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Ann Hastain | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
JANE ALISON MCKEAN | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £126.47k | £197.38k | £192.80k | £158.99k | £277.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £124.89k | £134.21k | £146.69k | £176.97k | £223.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £12.90k | £12.20k | £18.30k | £18.55k | £75.10k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.95k | £2.96k | £4.99k | £14.96k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 MARCH 2006.
Charitable objects
(A) TO SAFEGUARD, PROTECT AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL, OF CHILDREN AND PARENTS AND CARERS OF CHILDREN; (B) TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO OR MALTREATMENT OF CHILDREN; (C) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, POVERTY AND NEED AMONGST CHILDREN AND PARENTS AND CARERS OF CHILDREN; (D) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BETTER STANDARDS OF CHILD CARE WITHIN THE AREA OF THE ISLE OF WIGHT AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Area of benefit
THE ISLE OF WIGHT AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
EXCHANGE HOUSE
ST. CROSS LANE
NEWPORT
ISLE OF WIGHT
PO30 5BZ
- Phone:
- 01983533357
- Email:
- admin@homestartiow.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window