Accounts and annual returns FATIMA WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1117027
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 15 October 2021 30 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 October 2021 30 June 2022 On time
Annual return 15 October 2020 05 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 October 2020 05 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 15 October 2019 18 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 October 2019 18 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 15 October 2018 13 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 October 2018 13 February 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 15 October 2017 30 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 October 2017 30 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window