Trustees THE JEWISH LEADERSHIP COUNCIL
Charity number: 1115343
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nina Freedman | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Jonathan Zenios | Trustee | 03 June 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
MICHAEL HOWARD GOLDSTEIN | Trustee | 02 June 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Laura Marks | Trustee | 23 May 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Louise Sara Jacobs | Trustee | 23 May 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Keith Black | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Suzi Woolfson | Trustee | 08 August 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
MARK ISAAC ADLESTONE OBE DL | Trustee | 17 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
MARK MORRIS | Trustee | 22 May 2018 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Debra Jane Fox | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.