MYOTUBULAR TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise funds to find a cure for Myotubular Myopathy. As of 30th September 2010, this charity number is no longer active. It has been incorporated and a new charity number issued. Please see charity number 1137177. The name, activities and all assets and liablities have been transferred entirely to the new entity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 April 2006: Standard registration
- 11 March 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 11 March 2020: Funds transferred to 1137177 MYOTUBULAR TRUST
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 29 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 17 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26 JANUARY 2006
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF DISABILITY AND THE EXTENSION OF LIFE FOR BABIES, CHILDREN AND ADULTS SUFFERING FROM MYOTUBULAR MYOPATHY, BY PROMOTING THE STUDY OF, AND RESEARCH INTO, THE TREATMENT AND CURE OF THE MUSCLE WEAKNESS CAUSED BY MYOTUBULAR MYOPATHY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE EUROPE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window