SENTEBALE

Charity number: 1113544
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 04 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 04 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 06 September 2019 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 06 September 2019 68 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 25 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 25 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 11 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 11 May 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2015 01 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015

(These accounts
have been qualified)

01 June 2016 On time Download