SENTEBALE

Charity number: 1113544
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nicola Brewer Trustee 31 January 2014 None on record
DAMIAN WEST Trustee None on record
Tim Boucher Trustee 27 November 2014 None on record
Dr Tsitsi Chawatama Trustee 16 July 2015 None on record
Professor Baron Peter Piot Trustee 18 July 2019 None on record
MARK DYER Trustee None on record
JOHNNY HORNBY Chair 06 March 2012 None on record
BARONESS LYNDA CHALKER OF WALLASEY Trustee 06 March 2012
THE LILIESLEAF TRUST UK Received: On time
ROYAL GEOGRAPHICAL SOCIETY (WITH THE INSTITUTE OF BRITISH GEOGRAPHERS) Received: On time