TOTTENHAM HOTSPUR FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1113725
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £3.23m £4.31m £4.68m £2.90m £2.73m
Total expenditure £3.06m £3.21m £3.45m £3.12m £2.72m
Income from government contracts £274.88k £206.68k N/A £16.00k £63.00k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £119.90k £118.60k £300.74k £16.97k £57.93k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.11m £4.19m £4.36m £2.87m £2.65m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £9.20k £5.74k £10.58k £19.15k £15.08k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.06m £3.19m £3.45m £3.12m £2.72m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £19.68k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £5.64k £5.64k £5.64k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £38.91k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0