Financial history YAFA WELFARE ASSOCIATION IN WEST MIDLANDS

Charity number: 1114073
Charity reporting is overdue by 843 days

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A