HOME-START BIRMINGHAM CENTRAL AND SOUTH-WEST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Home-Start Birmingham Central and South-West is a voluntary organisation which supports families with at least one child under five through difficult times. Home-Start through trained parent volunteers offers befriending and emotional and practical support to families in the Bartley Green, Edgbaston, Harborne, Ladywood, Soho and Quinton wards of the city.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 29 June 2006: Standard registration
- HOME-START BARTLEY GREEN AND QUINTON (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sheeba Eeswaramorthy | Chair | 09 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Hall | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Everington | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Baksho Kaur Hayer | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paramjit Mattu | Trustee | 02 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marie Newton | Trustee | 02 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £95.28k | £138.00k | £126.36k | £84.22k | £175.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £98.51k | £101.00k | £101.85k | £93.98k | £143.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £65.50k | £65.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £4.40k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 NOV 2005 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11 APR 2017
Charitable objects
A) TO SAFEGUARD, PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL OF CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; B) TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO OR MALTREATMENT OF CHILDREN; C) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, POVERTY AND NEED AMONGST CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; D) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BETTER STANDARDS OF CHILDCARE; WITHIN THE AREAS OF BARTLEY GREEN AND QUINTON WARDS AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Area of benefit
BARTLEY GREEN AND QUINTON WARDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
CIBA Building
Suite 1
Lower Ground Floor
146 Hagley Road
Birmingham
- Phone:
- 07845085488
- Email:
- admin@homestartbcsw.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window