Trustees North London Adult Care Ltd

Charity number: 1115319
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Abdul Samad Billoo Trustee 02 March 2022
HEALTH AND NUTRITION DEVELOPMENT SOCIETY (HANDS) INTERNATIONAL
Received: On time
MUSLIM COMMUNITY & EDUCATION CENTRE (MCEC)
Received: On time
Kantilal Ramlal Topiwala Trustee 02 March 2022
None on record
Jayanti Premji Patel Trustee 02 March 2022
None on record
Jayant Kumar Mandavia Trustee 02 March 2022
None on record
BHARAT SOLANKI Trustee 21 November 2020
CAREDUCATION TRUST LTD
Received: On time
Rahana Hassan Trustee 09 September 2019
None on record
Talat Shaik Trustee 28 August 2018
None on record
KRISHNA PUJARA Trustee 28 August 2018
None on record
Mohammed Bazlur Rahman Trustee 06 February 2016
None on record
ALOK AGRAWAL Trustee 07 June 2013
AGRASEN SABHA UK
Overdue by 652 days
ENFIELD VOLUNTARY ACTION
Received: On time
ROTARY CLUB OF SOUTHGATE BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
MR RAMAN TAILOR Trustee
None on record