Trustees EAST LONDON DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 1114589
Charity reporting is up to date (166 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Deborah Jayne Morris Chair 01 September 2024
THE ROLAND PHILIPPS FUND FOR SCOUTS
Received: 166 days late
Stephen Charles Hockney Trustee 01 September 2024
THE ROLAND PHILIPPS FUND FOR SCOUTS
Received: 166 days late
Abdulmukith Ahmed Trustee 01 September 2024
THE ROLAND PHILIPPS FUND FOR SCOUTS
Received: 166 days late
James Poole Trustee 01 September 2023
THE ROLAND PHILIPPS FUND FOR SCOUTS
Received: 166 days late
Branca Mesquita De Oliveira Pegado Trustee 01 October 2022
THE ROLAND PHILIPPS FUND FOR SCOUTS
Received: 166 days late
Kamran Yousaf Trustee 01 September 2021
THE ROLAND PHILIPPS FUND FOR SCOUTS
Received: 166 days late
ANJUMAN-E-ISLAMIA, NEWHAM
Received: On time
BANDRAL SUPPORT NETWORK
Recently registered
Justine Sacarello Trustee 01 May 2020
THE ROLAND PHILIPPS FUND FOR SCOUTS
Received: 166 days late
Kevin Bridge Trustee 01 May 2018
THE ROLAND PHILIPPS FUND FOR SCOUTS
Received: 166 days late
CARL GREENSLADE Trustee 19 November 2012
THE ROLAND PHILIPPS FUND FOR SCOUTS
Received: 166 days late
JOAN BRIDGE Trustee
THE ROLAND PHILIPPS FUND FOR SCOUTS
Received: 166 days late